Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 02/16/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/01/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/08/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/29/2006