Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/01/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/25/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/25/2006