Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/14/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/06/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/20/2006