Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/16/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/30/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/25/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/02/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/02/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/02/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/04/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/09/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/19/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/07/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/08/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/12/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/15/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/15/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/15/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/15/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/16/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/16/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/19/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/26/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/14/2006