Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/16/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/26/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/27/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/27/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/02/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/18/2006