Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/29/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/29/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/30/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/30/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/04/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/04/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/04/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/04/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/05/2006