Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/02/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/02/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/23/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/12/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/12/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/12/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/14/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/11/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/13/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/14/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/19/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/19/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/21/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/25/2006