Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/26/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/26/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2006
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/26/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/26/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/03/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/04/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/04/2006