Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/26/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/26/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/02/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/09/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/23/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/13/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/26/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/11/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/25/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/26/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/13/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/13/2006