Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/27/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/27/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/27/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/27/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/02/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/02/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/22/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/17/2006