Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/02/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/03/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/03/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/03/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/03/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/11/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/24/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2006