Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/10/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/11/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/11/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/11/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/11/2006
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2006