Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/27/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/15/2006