Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/12/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/12/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/12/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/15/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/15/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/15/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/19/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/19/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/22/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/22/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/22/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/22/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/22/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/29/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/29/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/28/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/15/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/15/2006