Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/01/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/01/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/01/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/20/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/20/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/20/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/26/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/18/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/18/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/24/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/24/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/24/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/24/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/24/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/24/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/24/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/26/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/26/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/26/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/2006