Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/02/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/16/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/17/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/23/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/12/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/12/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/21/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/28/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/28/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/28/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/11/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/18/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/24/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/26/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/20/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/20/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/20/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/25/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/09/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/14/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/05/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/05/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/08/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2006