Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/03/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/03/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/03/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/03/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/03/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/03/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/08/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/08/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/08/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/08/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/08/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/08/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/08/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/08/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/08/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/09/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/09/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/09/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/09/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/10/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/10/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/10/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/15/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/16/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/17/2006