There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

Condemning the People's Republic of China for its continued interference in the internal affairs of the Catholic Church and its persecution of Catholics loyal to the Pope.

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the unauthorized, inappropriate, and coerced ordination of Catholic bishops by the People's Republic of China.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/12/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 1 (Roll no. 252).(text: CR H3732)
05/09/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
06/12/2006-7:06pmThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2006-7:06pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 1 (Roll no. 252). (text: CR H3732)
06/12/2006-7:06pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2006-6:58pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3750-3751)
06/12/2006-3:06pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/12/2006-2:48pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 804.
06/12/2006-2:48pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3732-3734)
06/12/2006-2:48pmMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
05/25/2006Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
05/25/2006Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/09/2006Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
05/09/2006Introduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/09/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/09/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/24/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/24/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/24/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/24/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/24/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/24/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/24/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/09/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations05/09/2006 Referred to
05/25/2006 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.804.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.804. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/12/2006)

Condemns the actions of the government of the People's Republic of China (PRC) to coerce Catholic bishops in China, both those in the Catholic Patriotic Association of China and those who remain loyal to the Pope, to violate their consciences and consecrate bishops in defiance of Rome.

Extends deepest sympathy to the Catholic population of China and the Catholic Church for this insult to their beliefs and religious practices.

Reaffirms the right of all religious organizations to choose their leaders free of intimidation or terror in accordance with the Uniform Declaration of Human Rights.

Urges the PRC to end its repression of religious organizations, recognize the ecclesiastical authority of religious leaders to provide spiritual leadership to their followers, and end the practice of only allowing religious worship through state-sanctioned patriotic religious associations.

Encourages the PRC to refrain from additional ordination of Catholic bishops while the Vatican and the Catholic Patriotic Association of China resolve their differences and adopt a mutually acceptable process for approving the elevation of bishops.