Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/22/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/28/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/13/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/13/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/26/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/28/2006