Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/15/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/15/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/15/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/20/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/03/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/06/2005