Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/17/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/06/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/18/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/18/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/26/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/13/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/07/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 11/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/12/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/16/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/31/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/28/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/13/2006