Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/07/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/20/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/20/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/20/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/20/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/20/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/20/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/22/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/22/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/22/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/27/2006