Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/20/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/22/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/22/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/2006