Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/16/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/16/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/26/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/20/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/20/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/19/2006