Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/10/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/25/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/13/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2006