Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/12/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/13/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/13/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/13/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/13/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/13/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/13/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/13/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/13/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/13/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/17/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/17/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/17/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/17/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/18/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/18/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/19/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2006