Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/26/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/26/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/26/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/06/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/06/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/06/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/06/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/06/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/06/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/06/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/14/2006