Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 07/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/19/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/19/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/19/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/19/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/19/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/19/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/20/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/20/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/20/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/21/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/21/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/25/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/26/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/26/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/26/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/27/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/28/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/28/2006