Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/26/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/26/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/28/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/12/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/26/2006