Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/28/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/06/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/27/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/13/2006