Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/06/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/06/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/06/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/06/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/06/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/06/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/06/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/06/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/06/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/14/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/20/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/28/2006