Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/07/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/12/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/12/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/12/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/12/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/12/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/12/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/12/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/12/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/12/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/12/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/14/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/14/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/14/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/14/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/19/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/19/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/25/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/25/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/25/2006