Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/13/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/13/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/13/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/13/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/06/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/12/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/14/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/26/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/30/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/05/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/25/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/14/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/14/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/26/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 01/26/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/10/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/16/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/16/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/01/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/15/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/07/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/24/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/24/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/24/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/24/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/24/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/26/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/26/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/26/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/01/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/01/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/01/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/08/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/08/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/11/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/18/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/18/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/22/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/23/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/23/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/25/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/25/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/25/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/19/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/20/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/23/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/29/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/10/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/17/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/20/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/21/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/24/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/25/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/26/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/31/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/02/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 08/02/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 08/02/2006
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 08/02/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 08/02/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/02/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 08/03/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 08/03/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 08/03/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 08/03/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 08/03/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/05/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/05/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 09/05/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/11/2006
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/19/2006