Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/15/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/20/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/22/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/22/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/28/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/04/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/08/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/19/2006
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/12/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/21/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/05/2006