Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/17/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/06/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/06/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/06/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/06/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/06/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/06/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/06/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/06/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/14/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/14/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/21/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/21/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/21/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/23/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/23/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/23/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/23/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/29/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/29/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/29/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/29/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/29/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/29/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/30/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/30/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/12/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/13/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/13/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/13/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/13/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/13/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/13/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/13/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/13/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/13/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/13/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/13/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/13/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/14/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 07/14/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/14/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/18/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/18/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/18/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/18/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 07/18/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/18/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/27/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/27/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/29/2005