Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/17/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/07/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/14/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/14/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/24/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/24/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 08/01/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 08/03/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/15/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/15/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/19/2006