Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 05/19/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 05/19/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/23/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/28/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/13/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/13/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/03/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 11/08/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/08/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/13/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/13/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/25/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/28/2006