Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 05/23/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/23/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/23/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/23/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/23/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/07/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/09/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/20/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/16/2006