Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/26/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/28/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/30/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/12/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/20/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/25/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/12/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/26/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/08/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/05/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/21/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew