Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/24/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/24/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/26/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/08/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/09/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/13/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/13/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/15/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/22/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/27/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/29/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/12/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/15/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/15/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/21/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/27/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/27/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/27/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/28/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/06/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/08/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/12/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/13/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/13/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/20/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/21/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/26/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/27/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/01/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/09/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/16/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/12/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/12/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/18/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/25/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/07/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/15/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/27/2006
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 02/28/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/07/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/07/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/09/2006
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/13/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/13/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/16/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/16/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/16/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/27/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/28/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/28/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/31/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/15/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/16/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/26/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/08/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/13/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/20/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/10/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/26/2006