Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/01/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-381.
12/01/2006 Signed by President.
11/21/2006 Presented to President.
11/13/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8589)
06/15/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6667; text as passed Senate: CR S6667)
06/09/2005 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
05/26/2005 Introduced in Senate