There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the State Route 1 Bridge in the State of Delaware as the "Senator William V. Roth, Jr. Bridge".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/01/2006Became Public Law No: 109-381. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/2006Signed by President.
11/21/2006Presented to President.
11/13/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8589)
06/15/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6667; text as passed Senate: CR S6667)
06/09/2005Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
05/26/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/01/2006Became Public Law No: 109-381. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/2006Signed by President.
11/21/2006SenatePresented to President.
11/13/2006-2:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2006-2:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8589)
11/13/2006-2:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1140.
11/13/2006-2:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8589-8590)
11/13/2006-2:41pmHouseMr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/19/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/16/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/16/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/16/2005-10:01amHouseReceived in the House.
06/15/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6667; text as passed Senate: CR S6667)
06/09/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 122.
06/09/2005SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
06/08/2005SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/26/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/26/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works05/26/2005 Referred to
06/08/2005 Markup by
06/09/2005 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/16/2005 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways, Transit and Pipelines06/19/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1140. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-381 (12/01/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the State Route 1 Bridge over the Chesapeake and Delaware Canal in Delaware as the "Senator William V. Roth, Jr. Bridge."