Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/12/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/24/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/10/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/25/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/31/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/13/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/06/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/28/2006