Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/13/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/21/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/21/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/21/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/21/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/25/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/25/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/29/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/29/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/29/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/13/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/13/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/22/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/27/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/27/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/27/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/02/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/09/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/26/2006