Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/08/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/08/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/09/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/09/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/09/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/13/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/14/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/14/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/16/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/16/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/16/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/16/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/16/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/16/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/20/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/20/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/21/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/24/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/28/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/28/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/30/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/30/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/11/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/11/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/11/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/11/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/11/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/12/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/13/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/18/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/19/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/19/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/19/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/21/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/27/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/28/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/28/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/14/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/15/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/26/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 09/28/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/28/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/04/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/04/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/04/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/04/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/26/2005