Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/26/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/01/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/02/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/07/2005