There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Great Ape Conservation Act of 2000.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/09/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9889-9890; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9889; text as passed Senate: CR S9890)
08/31/2005Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/29/2005 with amendments. With written report No. 109-123.
06/15/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/14/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
09/12/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
09/12/2005-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/09/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/09/2005SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9889-9890; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9889; text as passed Senate: CR S9890)
08/31/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
08/31/2005SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/29/2005 with amendments. With written report No. 109-123.
07/20/2005SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/15/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6662)
06/15/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6661-6662)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/15/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/15/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/15/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 06/15/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/16/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works06/15/2005 Referred to
07/20/2005 Markup by
08/31/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-123
House Resources09/12/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans09/14/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1250. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/09/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on August 31, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Great Ape Conservation Act of 2000 to: (1) authorize the Secretary of the Interior to approve projects to address the root causes of threats to great apes in range states; (2) grant the Secretary discretion in convening the expert panel established under the Act to identify conservation needs for the great ape; (3) exempt such panel from requirements of the Federal Advisory Committee Act; (4) increase funding for administrative expenses from the Great Ape Conservation Fund; and (5) increase and extend through FY2010 the authorization of appropriations to such Fund.