Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/22/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/01/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/11/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/12/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/06/2005