Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/23/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/15/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 10/06/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/17/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 01/25/2006