Summary: S.1310 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-156 (12/30/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on December 16, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area Improvement Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to grant an easement to the Columbia Gas Transmission Corporation to enlarge the diameter of a specified natural gas pipeline from 14 inches to not more than 20 inches, consistent with the recreational values and protection of the resources of the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area in Pennsylvania.

Authorizes the Superintendent of the Recreation Area to issue a permit to the Corporation for the use of the Recreation Area in accordance with specified procedural requirements for the temporary areas required for the construction of the enlarged pipeline.

Requires the Corporation to comply with Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) certification requirements for the increase in pipeline size.

Prohibits the Secretary from granting additional increases in the diameter of, or easements for, the pipeline within the boundary of the Recreation Area after the date of enactment of this Act.

Authorizes the Attorney General, at the Secretary's request, to bring against the Corporation a civil action for damages and response costs if the Corporation violates easement or permit provisions, fails to submit or timely implement an approved restoration and mitigation plan, or the violation or failure destroys, results in the loss of, or injures park system resources.

Amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to modify the effective date of the prohibition against the use of Highway 209 within Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area by certain commercial vehicles. Changes such date from noon on September 30, 2005, to the earlier of the date on which a feasible alternative is available, or noon of September 30, 2015.

Increases from $25 to $40 the maximum commercial use fee which the Secretary is required to collect from commercial vehicles until the effective date of the prohibition.

Extends the National Park System Advisory Board until January 1, 2007.